+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 270
- Action: Signed
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Goodale
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 4:45 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: ED (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass amended
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Goodale Floor Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Goodale Floor Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
2-28 ed-approp_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
4-18 ed_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
5-3 ed-approp_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
2-10 ed-approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 18, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
March 14, 2011: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 14, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
March 10, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
January 31, 2011: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor