+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Rules
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:17 pm
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
1-30 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
February 9, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor