+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
2-4fin_revised
Senate Fact Sheet
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Vote
February 3, 2014: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor