+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Rules
- Jud
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: McCune Davis flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (4)
McCune Davis Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-25 ced_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
McCune Davis Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-5 ced
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2010: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 22, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
February 1, 2010: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8