+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Failed to pass
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Approp
- Rules
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: EDJC (ref Bill)
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Economic Development and Jobs Creation: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Economic Development and Jobs Creation
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Economic Development and Jobs Creation - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Economic Development and Jobs Creation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Economic Development and Jobs Creation - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Economic Development and Jobs Creation - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Economic Development and Jobs Creation - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Economic Development and Jobs Creation
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2012: Ways and Means: Failed to pass (House)
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
February 27, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 4
February 2, 2012: Economic Development and Jobs Creation: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7