+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
On April 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 9, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - McClure
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Gallardo
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 amobject
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Government: Withdrawn
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Gray C flr amend (ref Bill) (sub JUD)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate second read
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (13)
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gray C Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill; substitute to JUD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
McClure Floor Amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
McClure Floor Amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Gray C Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill; substitute to JUD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-7 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
4-16 house changes memo
Senate Fact Sheet
2-23 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
5-3jud_asvetoed
Senate Fact Sheet
2-1jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 23, 2007: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
April 9, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 4
February 22, 2007: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
February 22, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 21, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
January 25, 2007: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor