+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 47
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:47 pm
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: CEM (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Shooter flr amend (ref CEM)
- Third read: Passed
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Shooter flr amend (ref CEM) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Shooter flr amend (ref CEM) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-21 cem_strikermemo_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
2-18 cem_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 2, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 5, 2013: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 4, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 6, 2013: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor