+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:12PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Ways & Means Committee: do pass.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways & Means Committee.
- First read in House.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Brophy McGee flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- FIN (ref Bill) adopted
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 27, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 20
March 7, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 7, 2019: House Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 4, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 30, 2019: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 10