+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 161
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment passed: MAPS
- Third read: Passed
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment withdrawn: PSMT (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref APPROP)
- Amendment adopted: Kavanagh flr amend (ref APPROP)
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 26, 2015: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 24, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
March 12, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 12, 2015: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 6, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
February 2, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
February 2, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor