+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:17PM.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- House Government Committee: do pass.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- FIN (ref Bill) adopted
- Mesnard flr amend (ref FIN) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
February 26, 2019: House Government Committee
- Yeas: 10
February 26, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 14, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 30, 2019: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor