+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- GOV (ref Bill) adopted
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended.
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 23, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
February 18, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 25, 2021: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor