+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 86
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Do pass
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Commerce: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:40 pm
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Water and Energy: Do pass
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Water and Energy
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (5)
March 23, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 3
March 2, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 2, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 19, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2015: Water and Energy: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor