+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 103
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:07 pm
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: HMLR (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-8 health
Senate Fact Sheet
2-14 health_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 6, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
March 3, 2011: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 3, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2011: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor