+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On May 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 13, 2008 in the House:
- Representative paton moved that the House reconsider sb 1297 on tuesday, may 13, 2008. motion passed by v/v.
- Motion
- Vote detail 34 22 4 0 passed
On May 6, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Failed
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 am
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- Water and Agriculture: Do pass
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On March 19, 2008 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Water and Agriculture
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 12:38 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Senate second read
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (2)
2-21gov
Senate Fact Sheet
5-22 as vetoed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
May 13, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 4
May 6, 2008: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 7
March 19, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
March 19, 2008: Water and Agriculture: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
March 13, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
January 31, 2008: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor