+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 179
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSMT (ref Bill)
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 25, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2015: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 12, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 6, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
February 11, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor