+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 233
- Action: Signed
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: WLRD (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Water, Land Use and Rural Development: Do pass amended
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Water, Land Use and Rural Development
- Finance: Withdrawn
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Water, Land Use and Rural Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Water, Land Use and Rural Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Water, Land Use and Rural Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Water, Land Use and Rural Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
2-14 wlurd
Senate Fact Sheet
3-7 wlrd_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 14, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
March 14, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
March 14, 2011: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
March 8, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
February 14, 2011: Water, Land Use and Rural Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor