+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held in House
On April 7, 2010 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 2:25 pm
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Finance: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-5 ced
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
March 15, 2010: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
March 15, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2010: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor