+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Failed
- Final disposition: Failed in Senate on third reading
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSMT (ref Bill)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Public Safety, Military and Technology - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2015: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 16
February 4, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor