+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 71
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment: RULES - W/D
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On June 25, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On June 24, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass
On June 23, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
- Senate second read
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
Senate Proposed Amendment
6-15 nripd
Senate Fact Sheet
Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
June 26, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 50
- Present/NV: 10
June 23, 2009: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
June 23, 2009: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
June 22, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
June 4, 2009: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor