+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: withdrawn.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Shope flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass.
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 12
January 25, 2021: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor