+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: APPROP - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to APPROP - Stevens
- Third read: Passed
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSMT (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Smith flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Proposed Amendment
Smith flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 2, 2015: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
April 1, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
March 9, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
January 29, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
January 29, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8