+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Weninger - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- RULES (ref COMPS) withdrawn
- Farnsworth flr amend (ref Bill) (sub COMPS) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
May 10, 2017: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
May 9, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 14
February 28, 2017: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 28, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 23, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 26, 2017: Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8