+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: held.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- FIN (ref Bill) adopted
- RULES (ref FIN) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
February 25, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
January 26, 2016: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
January 26, 2016: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor