+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 252
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:40 pm
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce amd Workforce Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
Health
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 2, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2015: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
February 25, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 19, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2015: Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1