+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 71
- Action: Signed
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 3:07 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
2-7 gr
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 6, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
March 2, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 2, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2011: Government Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor