+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Rules
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-6 gr
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 2012: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
February 16, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
January 26, 2012: Government Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1