+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 14, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On May 7, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On March 19, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Health
- House first read
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: McCune Davis flr amend (ref HEALTH)
- Amendment failed: Gray C flr amend (ref HEALTH)
- Amendment adopted: Huppenthal flr amend (ref HEALTH)
- Amendment adopted: HEALTH (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass amended
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Senate second read
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Huppenthal Floor Amendment, reference to HEALTH amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
McCune Davis Floor Amendment, reference to HEALTH amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health
Senate Proposed Amendment
McCune Davis Floor Amendment, reference to HEALTH amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health
Senate Adopted Amendment
Huppenthal Floor Amendment, reference to HEALTH amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-6health caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Health
Senate Proposed Amendment
3-21 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
March 19, 2007: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
March 19, 2007: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 19, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
March 12, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 4
January 25, 2007: Health: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1