+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Salman - failed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:02PM.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 11:10AM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 23
February 26, 2018: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
February 26, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 21, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
January 23, 2018: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor