+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Amended by WM - failed
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:12PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 19, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 19, 2018: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 8, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 23, 2018: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 7