+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 192
- Action: Signed
On May 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
On May 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 29, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 24, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Barnes
- Amendment passed: RULES
- Amendment: CMMA - W/D
- Amendment passed: ENV
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 17, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- Environment: Do pass amended
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended
On March 24, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
- Assigned to committee: Environment
- Ways and Means: Withdrawn
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
- House first read
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: NRRA (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Flake flr amend (ref NRRA)
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Senate second read
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (15)
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Flake Floor Amendment; reference to NRRA amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Environment
House Adopted Amendment
Barnes Floor Amendment Refrence to Senate Engrossed Bill
House Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Flake Floor Amendment; reference to NRRA amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Barnes Floor Amendment Refrence to Senate Engrossed Bill
House Adopted Amendment
Environment
House Adopted Amendment
2-25 strikermemo-caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
2-18nrra_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
3-21 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
May 7, 2008: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
April 29, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 2
March 24, 2008: Environment: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
March 20, 2008: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 20, 2008: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
March 18, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
January 31, 2008: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor