+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 233
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 3, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 1:43 pmobject
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Environment: Do pass
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: WLRD (ref Bill)
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Water, Land Use and Rural Development: Do pass amended
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Water, Land Use and Rural Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Water, Land Use and Rural Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Water, Land Use and Rural Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-13 wlrd_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Water, Land Use and Rural Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Water, Land Use and Rural Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
2-6 wlrd
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 2
February 21, 2012: Environment: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 21, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 20, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
January 26, 2012: Water, Land Use and Rural Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor