+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2011: Government: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
March 8, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
March 3, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 5
January 27, 2011: Government Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor