+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Failed
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Yee flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:33 pmobject
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
Yee flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 2, 2015: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2015: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2015: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor