+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Senate concurred.
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- EENR - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Cook - passed
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee: do pass amended.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- NREW (ref Bill) adopted
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
April 19, 2017: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 28
April 17, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
March 6, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 6, 2017: House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
March 1, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 31, 2017: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 31, 2017: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor