+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 58
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 7, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 6, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Jones
On April 5, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 31, 2010 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
- House second read
On March 30, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: HEALTH (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Leff flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
2-15 health
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 5
March 30, 2010: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
March 30, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
March 8, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
February 1, 2010: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor