+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 84
- Action: Signed
On April 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 21, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 am
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 31, 2008 in the House:
- Financial Institutions and Insurance: Do pass
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On March 25, 2008 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions and Insurance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref FIIR)
- Amendment adopted: FIIR (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement: Do pass amended
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
- Senate second read
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (8)
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
Senate Proposed Amendment
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
Senate Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-27 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
2-21fiir
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 21, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 2
March 25, 2008: Financial Institutions and Insurance: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 25, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
March 13, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
January 31, 2008: Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5