+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Aw
- Rules
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Crandell flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:22 pmobject
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Crandell flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Crandell flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
January 30, 2013: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1