+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Final disposition: Held awaiting House adoption of conference report
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Conference committee recommended
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Hale
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Hale Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
1-31 ge
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
March 25, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 5, 2013: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 14, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor