+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Line item veto - signed
- Chapter: 277
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- House reports to conference committee
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate reports to conference committee
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate appointed: Pierce, Farley, Worsley
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- House appointed: Kavanagh, Orr, Sherwood
- Recommendation: that the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Conference committee recommended
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: EENR
- Amendment withdrawn: SUB Floor Amend to EENR - Orr
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Hale
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Orr #1
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Orr #2
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Kavanagh #1
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Gonzales motion to excl Orr #1 flr am to bill failed by RCV
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Energy, Environment and Natural Resources: Do pass amended
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: NRRA (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Pierce flr amend (ref NRRA)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (20)
Orr Floor Amendment #1; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Floor Amendment #1; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
House Adopted Amendment
Hale Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
House Proposed Amendment
Pierce flr amend (ref NRRA) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
House Proposed Amendment
Pierce flr amend (ref NRRA) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Adopted Amendment
Orr Floor Amendment #2; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Orr Floor Amendment #1; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Floor Amendment #1; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Hale Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Adopted Amendment
Orr Floor Amendment #2; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 24, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
April 24, 2014: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
April 17, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
March 11, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
March 11, 2014: Energy, Environment and Natural Resources: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
March 6, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
February 3, 2014: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor