+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 185
- Action: Signed
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to Senate
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On June 29, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On June 25, 2009 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On June 18, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 16, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: C. Gray flr amend (ref JUD)
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate second read
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (8)
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
C Gray Floor Amendment; reference to JUD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
6-11 strikermemo caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
C Gray Floor Amendment; reference to JUD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
1281jud_strikermemo.doc
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
July 1, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
June 17, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
June 17, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
June 16, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
June 4, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor