+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:12PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (3)
March 1, 2022: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 11
February 23, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
January 24, 2022: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor