+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- House Education Committee: withdrawn.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- ED (ref Bill) adopted
- RULES (ref ED) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (11)
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 16, 2016: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
March 16, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 1
March 2, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
March 2, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
February 22, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
February 22, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
January 26, 2016: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 26, 2016: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 26, 2016: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
January 26, 2016: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor