+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 103
- Action: Signed
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:16 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:22 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Safety: Do pass
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety
- Senate first read
+ − Votes (5)
April 8, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2013: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 21, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
January 30, 2013: Public Safety: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor