+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Mesnard - passed
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee: withdrawn.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- COMPS (ref Bill) withdrawn
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
May 4, 2017: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 30
May 4, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
February 28, 2017: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 11
February 28, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 27, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 26, 2017: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 26, 2017: Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 7