+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 70
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: COM
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor amend to COM - McCune Davis
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy: Do pass
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Energy
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
McCune Davis Substitute Floor Amendment to the Commerce Committee Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
McCune Davis Substitute Floor Amendment to the Commerce Committee Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
2-7 ce
Senate Fact Sheet
4-5 ce_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 7, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
April 4, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 1
February 28, 2011: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 28, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
February 22, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
January 27, 2011: Commerce and Energy: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor