+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by GOV - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Government Committee: do pass amended.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- GOV (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 11, 2018: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 30
April 9, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 1
February 27, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 27, 2018: House Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 21, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 23, 2018: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 23, 2018: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1