+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Shope flr amend (ref NREW) adopted
- NREW (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass amended.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 4, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 12
February 3, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
January 21, 2021: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor