+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 115
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: EENR
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to EENR - Pratt
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Energy, Environment and Natural Resources: Do pass amended
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Vote detail 21 9 0 0 y passed
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
- Senator griffin motion to reconsider whereby the Senate passed sb 1274 on third reading on february 27, 2014. motion carried.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Griffin flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:20 pmobject
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (10)
Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
House Proposed Amendment
Griffin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Pratt Floor Amendment; Reference to ENERGY, ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
House Adopted Amendment
Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
House Proposed Amendment
Pratt Floor Amendment; Reference to ENERGY, ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Griffin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
House Adopted Amendment
2-5ge_revised
Senate Fact Sheet
1-30gr
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 16, 2014: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
April 15, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
March 4, 2014: Energy, Environment and Natural Resources: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
March 4, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
February 27, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
January 30, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor