+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting concurrence or conference
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to APPROP - Montenegro
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Amended by APPROP - Olson
- Amendment passed: Amended by TI - Gray
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Gray
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Coleman
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Friese
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Fann
- Third read: Passed
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Withdrawn
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass amended
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Worsley flr amend #1 (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: TRANS (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Worsley flr amend #2 (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Farley flr amend #1 (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Farley flr amend #2 (ref Bill)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (20)
Worsley #2 flr amend (ref Bill) failed
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Farley #2 flr amend (ref Bill) failed
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation and Infrastructure
House Proposed Amendment
Farley #1 flr amend (ref Bill) failed
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Transportation and Infrastructure
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Worsley flr amend #1 (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Transportation and Infrastructure
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Gray - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Fann - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to APPROP - Montenegro - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Coleman - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 2, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 2
March 18, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 5
March 10, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 10, 2015: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 24, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
January 29, 2015: Transportation: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor