+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Engrossed Bill - John - passed
- Floor Amend to Engrossed Bill - Syms - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Farnsworth - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Failed
- Representative Farnsworth moved the House reconsider SB 1273 within the next 14 days. Motion passed by v/v.
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:54PM.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee: do pass.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- GOV (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
May 2, 2018: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
April 18, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 27
March 5, 2018: House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
March 5, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 28, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 11
January 23, 2018: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor